NJ A4603 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3061 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3061 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for businesses that participate in DOL registered apprenticeship programs; establishes grant program for tax-exempt organizations participating in DOL registered apprenticeship programs.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for businesses that participate in DOL registered apprenticeship programs; establishes grant program for tax-exempt organizations participating in DOL registered apprenticeship programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3061 (3R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3061 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.417.