NJ A4373 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes youthful age of defendant as mitigating factor in sentencing.
Title
Establishes youthful age of defendant as mitigating factor in sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2592 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.110. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-7) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2592 |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-3-1) |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2592 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4373