NJ A4373 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State oversight of municipalities in the Transitional Aid to Localities Program; appropriates $140,500,000 to DCA for Transitional Aid to Localities and administrative costs.
Title
Authorizes State oversight of municipalities in the Transitional Aid to Localities Program; appropriates $140,500,000 to DCA for Transitional Aid to Localities and administrative costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Norcross [D] | Rep. Sheila Oliver [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-20 | Approved P.L.2011, c.144. | |
2011-12-15 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-16-0) | |
2011-12-15 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Senate (35-4) | |
2011-12-15 | Emergency Resolution (37-0) (Norcross) | |
2011-12-15 | Senate Amendment (35-1) (Norcross) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for S3118 | |
2011-12-08 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-12-08 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-12-05 | Passed by the Assembly (66-12-1) | |
2011-12-05 | Motion Waive Rule 15:11b (Prieto) (Voice) | |
2011-12-05 | Motion Suspend 10:18A (Prieto) (Voice) | |
2011-12-01 | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S3118 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by A4373