NJ A4285 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Health to develop voluntary registry to collect cancer incidence data from firefighters.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Health to develop voluntary registry to collect cancer incidence data from firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3313 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3313 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.113. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3313 (1R) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3313 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4285 (1R)