NJ A4241 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S766
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.453.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.453.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to conduct biennial survey of SNAP experience.
Title
Requires DHS to conduct biennial survey of SNAP experience.
Sponsors
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2894 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2894 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.453. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-2-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S2894 (1R) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-2-0) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4241 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.453.
S2894 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4241 (2R)
S2894 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4241 (2R)