NJ A4120 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes special assessments and bond issuance to replace lead-contaminated water service lines.
Title
Authorizes special assessments and bond issuance to replace lead-contaminated water service lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2695 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.114. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2695 |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-2-0) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2695 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4120