NJ A4072 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.277.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.277.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit, select, and train veterans for school security positions in school districts.
Title
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit, select, and train veterans for school security positions in school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3078 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3078 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.277. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3078 (2R) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3078 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A4072 (3R)