NJ A3717 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5041
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.274.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.274.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers from making certain retroactive reductions in claims payments to pharmacies; requires pharmacy benefits managers to disclose certain product information to pharmacies.*
Title
Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers from making certain retroactive reductions in claims payments to pharmacies; requires pharmacy benefits managers to disclose certain product information to pharmacies.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S728 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S728 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.274. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-2) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (71-3-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Greenstein) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (36-0) (Greenstein) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S728 (SCS) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-3) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S728 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A3717 (2R)
A5041 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5041 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading