NJ S728 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3390
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A3717 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A3717 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers from making certain retroactive reductions in claims payments to pharmacies; requires pharmacy benefits managers to disclose certain product information to pharmacies.*
Title
Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers from making certain retroactive reductions in claims payments to pharmacies; requires pharmacy benefits managers to disclose certain product information to pharmacies.*
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] |
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A3717 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3390 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3717 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.274.
A3717 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.274.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S728 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/728_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S728 |