NJ A357 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4260
Note: Carry Over of previous S1915
Note: Carry Over of previous S1915
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tuition benefits at public institutions of higher education to New Jersey residents who are members of reserve component of Armed Forces of United States.
Title
Provides tuition benefits at public institutions of higher education to New Jersey residents who are members of reserve component of Armed Forces of United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A357 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1915 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2115 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2488 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1915 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2115 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2488 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A357 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/357_I1.HTM |