NJ A3494 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows license plate frame to obscure certain parts of permanent or temporary license plate under certain conditions.
Title
Allows license plate frame to obscure certain parts of permanent or temporary license plate under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Shama Haider [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2381 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2381 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.49. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2381 (2R) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-1-0) |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2381 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Substituted by A3494 (1R)