NJ A3391 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1442
Note: Carry Over of previous S3580
Note: Carry Over of previous S3580
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S498 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S498 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to "Criminal Injuries Compensation Act of 1971."
Title
Makes various changes to "Criminal Injuries Compensation Act of 1971."
Sponsors
Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S498 (2R) |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3391 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S498 (2R)
S498 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.380.
S3580 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S498 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.380.
S3580 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee