NJ S498 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3580

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various changes to "Criminal Injuries Compensation Act of 1971."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes to "Criminal Injuries Compensation Act of 1971."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3580 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3391 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback