NJ A3382 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits taxpayers to make dedicated prepayment toward anticipated property taxes.
Title
Permits taxpayers to make dedicated prepayment toward anticipated property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1971 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1971 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.8. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Substituted for S1971 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Motion To Table (41-26-0) (Greenwald) |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Handlin) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1971 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by A3382