NJ A3094 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved P.L.2011, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved P.L.2011, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits DOT to contract with county or municipality for certain work on highways to prevent public hazards.
Title
Permits DOT to contract with county or municipality for certain work on highways to prevent public hazards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved P.L.2011, c.46. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) | |
2011-01-06 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-12-20 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-12-20 | Substituted for S2180 (1R) | |
2010-12-06 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-22 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee | |
2010-11-22 | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) | |
2010-11-15 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2180 (Same As) 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A3094 (1R)