NJ A3012 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes bestiality.
Title
Criminalizes bestiality.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Ciattarelli [R] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Rep. Donna Simon [R] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2296 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2296 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2296 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.133. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2296 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2296 (Same As) 2015-05-18 - Substituted by A3012