NJ S2296 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Substituted by A3012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Substituted by A3012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes bestiality.
Title
Criminalizes bestiality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Substituted by A3012 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3012 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.133.