NJ A2899 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Division on Women to conduct an audit of the coordination of community responses to domestic violence.
Title
Directs the Division on Women to conduct an audit of the coordination of community responses to domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1152 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1152 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.246. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S1152 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1152 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2899