NJ A2810 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.112.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.112.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires active supervision of certain professional and occupational licensing boards.
Title
Requires active supervision of certain professional and occupational licensing boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2963 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.112. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2963 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2963 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A2810 (1R)