NJ S2963 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A2810 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires active supervision of certain professional and occupational licensing boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires active supervision of certain professional and occupational licensing boards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted by A2810 (1R)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2810 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.112.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback