NJ A2762 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4744

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law concerning temporary disability leave.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law concerning temporary disability leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1317 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.122.
2018-09-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-8-0)
2018-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2018-08-27AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2018-08-27AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2018-06-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted for S1317 (2R)
2018-06-21SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-5-5)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1317 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A2762 (1R)
A4744 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback