NJ S1317 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3334

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A2762 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law concerning temporary disability leave.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law concerning temporary disability leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted by A2762 (1R)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2762 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
S3334 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback