NJ A2691 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S532
Note: Carry Over of previous A4655
Note: Carry Over of previous S3063
Note: Carry Over of previous A4655
Note: Carry Over of previous S3063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tuition fee waiver apprenticeship courses.
Title
Provides tuition fee waiver apprenticeship courses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2691 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1158 (Same As) 2020-08-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4655 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3063 (2R)
S3063 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S1158 (Same As) 2020-08-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4655 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3063 (2R)
S3063 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2691 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2691_I1.HTM |