NJ S3063 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides tuition fee waiver apprenticeship courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides tuition fee waiver apprenticeship courses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4655 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback