NJ A2481 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides remedies for certain fraudulent financing statements.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides remedies for certain fraudulent financing statements.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2106 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2106 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-11AssemblyApproved P.L.2015, c.59.
2015-03-26AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2015-03-19AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2015-03-16SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2015-03-16SenateSubstituted for S2106 (SCS)
2015-03-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-12-15SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2014-12-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2014-11-13AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mazzeo)
2014-09-18AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2014-02-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2106 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A2481 (ACS/2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback