NJ A2289 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5229
Note: Carry Over of previous S2333
Note: Carry Over of previous S2333
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to continuously maintain open enrollment period for federal Housing Choice Voucher Program pre-applications.
Title
Requires DCA to continuously maintain open enrollment period for federal Housing Choice Voucher Program pre-applications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5229 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2333 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2749 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2333 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2749 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2289 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2289_I1.HTM |