NJ A2228 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4324
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Includes all disabled veterans in NJT discount program for senior citizens and persons with disabilities.
Title
Includes all disabled veterans in NJT discount program for senior citizens and persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2489 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.20. |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2489 |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4324 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2489 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A2228
S2489 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A2228