NJ A1827 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1446
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved P.L.2018, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved P.L.2018, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns earned sick leave to employees.*
Title
Concerns earned sick leave to employees.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2171 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.10. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-12) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Substituted for S2171 (SCS) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-24-1) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (49-26-0) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Auth) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1446 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2171 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A1827 (ACS/1R)
S2171 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A1827 (ACS/1R)