NJ A1712 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5709
Note: Carry Over of previous S3969
Note: Carry Over of previous S3969
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S1047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S1047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns disclosure of certain information prior to sale of real estate.
Title
Concerns disclosure of certain information prior to sale of real estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S1047 |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5709 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1047 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.268.
S3969 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1047 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.268.
S3969 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee