NJ A1330 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2628

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-21 - Approved P.L.2018, c.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Directs Dept. of Agriculture to create pilot program to research cultivation of industrial hemp.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs Dept. of Agriculture to create pilot program to research cultivation of industrial hemp.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2491 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-21SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.139.
2018-09-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2)
2018-09-27SenateSubstituted for S2491
2018-09-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-0-7)
2018-02-15AssemblyAssembly Substitution (Gusciora)
2018-02-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2628 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2491 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Substituted by A1330 (AS)
S3145 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback