NJ A1286 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4290
Note: Carry Over of previous S2708
Note: Carry Over of previous S2708
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits eligible immigrants to obtain professional and occupational licenses in State.
Title
Permits eligible immigrants to obtain professional and occupational licenses in State.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4290 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S843 (Same As) 2020-08-10 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2708 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S843 (Same As) 2020-08-10 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2708 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee