NJ S843 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2708
Note: Carryover of previous A4290

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits eligible immigrants to obtain professional and occupational licenses in State.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits eligible immigrants to obtain professional and occupational licenses in State.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2708 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1286 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A4290 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback