NJ A1165 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the period of time required for a State college faculty member to receive tenure.*
Title
Revises the period of time required for a State college faculty member to receive tenure.*
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1160 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1160 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.235. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-0-1) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (39-0) (Weinberg) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S1160 (3R) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Weinberg) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Weinberg) |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-2) |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1160 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A1165 (4R)