NJ A1155 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5150
Note: Carry Over of previous S3547
Note: Carry Over of previous S3547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJT to operate Access Link paratransit service during state of emergency under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires NJT to operate Access Link paratransit service during state of emergency under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S362 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5150 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S362 (Same As) 2020-08-12 - Approved P.L.2020, c.62.
S3547 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S362 (Same As) 2020-08-12 - Approved P.L.2020, c.62.
S3547 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee