NJ S362 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Approved P.L.2020, c.62.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires NJT to operate Access Link paratransit service during state of emergency under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires NJT to operate Access Link paratransit service during state of emergency under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1155 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-12AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.62.
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2020-07-30AssemblySubstituted for A1155
2020-06-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3547 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A1155 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S362

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback