NJ A1153 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by S225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by S225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of State Highway Route No. 35 as "Chosin Few Memorial Highway." *
Title
Designates portion of State Highway Route No. 35 as "Chosin Few Memorial Highway." *
Sponsors
Rep. David Rible [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-13 | Substituted by S225 | |
2010-11-15 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S225 (Same As) 2011-01-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.12.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A1153 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A1500/1153_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A1500/1153_R1.HTM |