NH SB78 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by the Governor on 07/18/2017; Chapter 0254; Effective 09/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by the Governor on 07/18/2017; Chapter 0254; Effective 09/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to confidentiality of state tax records in state administrative or judicial proceedings.
Title
Relative to confidentiality of state tax records in state administrative or judicial proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/18/2017; Chapter 0254; Effective 09/16/2017 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2344c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2344c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 6 |
2017-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Report #2017-2344c Filed 06/15/2017; Senate Amendment + New Amendment |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/14/2017, 03:00 pm, Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2017-06-08 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Abrami, Lang, Burns, Walz 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 6 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Packard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 6 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Giuda, D'Allesandro; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1645h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 22 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1645h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 22 |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1645h (NT) for 06/01/2017 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 10 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-05-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-19 | House | Public Hearing: 04/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |