NH SB75 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB75

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a tax credit against business profits taxes for donations to career and technical education centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a tax credit against business profits taxes for donations to career and technical education centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-03 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Rerefer to Committee (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03SenateRefer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-03SenateSen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on the vote of Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-03SenateRefer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2017-12-13SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48
2017-03-09SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
2017-02-22SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12
2017-01-26SenateHearing: 02/01/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 8
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

Same As/Similar To

SB75 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback