NH SB677 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to protective orders for vulnerable adults.
Title
Relative to protective orders for vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. David Starr [R] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Thomas Buco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 100, State House, 10:35 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |