NH SB662 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to an exemption from interest and dividends taxes for medical expenses.
Title
Relative to an exemption from interest and dividends taxes for medical expenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 2 |