NH SB624 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a school marshals program.
Title
Establishing a school marshals program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Mark Vallone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 2 |