NH SB513 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Sununu Youth Service Center.
Title
Relative to the Sununu Youth Service Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2016, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 3 |