NH SB458 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Sununu youth services center and operation of a replacement secure facility.
Title
Relative to the Sununu youth services center and operation of a replacement secure facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 182 N: 150 NV: 22 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed |
2022-05-19 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/19/2022, 10:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2022, 09:30 am, Room 100, State House |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/18/2022, 12:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2022-05-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. DeSimone, Erf, Wallner 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. Rice, Umberger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Bradley, Rosenwald; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/26/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/25/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/22/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 244-88 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | FLAM # 2022-1640h (Rep. Lynn): Amendment Failed DV 160-171 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 1470h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 182-150 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1440h |
2022-04-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1470h (Vote 13-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 12 |
2022-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1266s and 2022-1272s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Rosenwald Floor Amendment # 2022-1272s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1266s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1266s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13A |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1057s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1057s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1057s, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |