NH SB454 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring public school students to receive CPR training.
Title
Requiring public school students to receive CPR training.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Robert Introne [R] | Rep. David Lundgren [R] | Rep. Betsy McKinney [R] |
Rep. Daniel Tamburello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/11/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |