NH SB449 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the retention of social security numbers by the division of motor vehicles.
Title
Relative to the retention of social security numbers by the division of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1192s (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1192s (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Transportation |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1192s, Regular Calendar 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2022-1192s, Regular Calendar 10Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1127s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1127s, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |