NH SB431 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting schedules.
Title
Relative to child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting schedules.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
Rep. Edward Gordon [R] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 178 N: 151 NV: 20 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1575h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-151 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1575h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1575h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0326s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0326s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0326s, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |