NH SB426 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the commission on primary care workforce issues.
Title
Relative to the commission on primary care workforce issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. John Fothergill [R] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Polly Campion [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |