NH SB422 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changing several references and modifying language in parentage and birth records.
Title
Changing several references and modifying language in parentage and birth records.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-12 | House | Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1458s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1458s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1458s, 04/11/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 14A |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |