NH SB349 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to city chief elections officers.
Title
Relative to city chief elections officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Catherine Cheney [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] |
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/17/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |