NH SB317 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Signed by the Governor on 03/12/2024; Chapter 0006; Effective 05/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Signed by the Governor on 03/12/2024; Chapter 0006; Effective 05/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a New Hampshire-Ireland trade council.
Title
Relative to establishing a New Hampshire-Ireland trade council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 03/12/2024; Chapter 0006; Effective 05/11/2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 27 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 02/21/2024); Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/12/2024 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-02-07 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/09/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-02-07 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/16/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/04/2024 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 73 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0147s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0147s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0147s, 01/18/2024, Vote 3-0; Senate Calendar 3A |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |